Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 71 Today
» 966 Yesterday
» 2110 Week
» 21436 Month
» 248197 Year
» 759299 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D182 27/09/1962
TOPS (Tops) 46045 06/10/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 46
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 27/09/1962
Withdrawn 01/11/1984
Time in Service 22 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52A Gateshead (New) 27/09/1962
   Withdrawn 01/11/1984

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Undergoing construction. SLS 7/1962 Link
27/09/1962 To Service To service as D182
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
08/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
06/02/1972 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Sidings. RO 4/1972 Link
06/10/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 46045    
01/11/1984 Withdrawn Condemned as 46045    

prev prev