Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 606 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14012 Week
» 67028 Month
» 186555 Year
» 3213408 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1822 |
05/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47341 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/03/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/03/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1822 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 584 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47341 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
02/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Toton Training Compound |
|
|