Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1431 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14837 Week
» 67853 Month
» 187380 Year
» 3214233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1824 |
10/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47343 |
21/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
10/03/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/03/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1824 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 586 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
21/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47343 |
|
|
29/06/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47343 |
|
|
10/11/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|