Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 69 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17872 Week
» 70888 Month
» 190415 Year
» 3217268 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1826 |
11/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47345 |
20/09/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/03/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/03/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1826 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 588 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
20/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47345 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
30/06/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47345 |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|