Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 933 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14339 Week
» 67355 Month
» 186882 Year
» 3213735 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1829 |
05/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47348 |
26/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/03/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/03/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1829 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 591 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
26/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47348 |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
30/11/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47348 |
|
|
12/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|