Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 902 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18705 Week
» 71721 Month
» 191248 Year
» 3218101 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1831 |
27/04/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47350 |
22/10/1973 |
|
TOPS (57/0) |
57005 |
01/04/1999 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/04/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/04/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/04/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1831 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 593 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
22/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47350 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
01/04/1999 |
Naming |
Named 'Freightliner Excellence' |
|
|
01/04/1999 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57005 |
|
|