Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1066 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18869 Week
» 71885 Month
» 191412 Year
» 3218265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1833 |
27/04/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47352 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/04/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/04/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
18/06/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
16/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Not Known |
|
10/10/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/04/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1833 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 595 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
23/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47352 |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
24/05/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Raxstar: at Frodingham MPD |
|
|
14/07/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47352 |
|
|