Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1078 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14484 Week
» 67500 Month
» 187027 Year
» 3213880 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1850 |
19/06/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47200 |
28/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/06/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/06/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1976 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
11/12/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1850 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 612 Allocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
28/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47200 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
31/12/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47200 |
|
|
05/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|