Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 79 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4345 Week
» 16123 Month
» 305515 Year
» 816617 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1855 24/08/1965
TOPS (1973) 47205 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 617
To Service 24/08/1965
Withdrawn 30/09/2004
Time in Service 39 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys
Cut Up 31/12/2004
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5A Crewe Diesel (New) 24/08/1965
WL Western Lines (LMR) 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division 17/06/1968
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 07/01/1970
D01 London Division w/e 06/05/1972
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 12/01/1974
CW Cricklewood East w/e 11/05/1974
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 28/02/1976
   Withdrawn 30/09/2004

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/08/1965 To Service To service as D1855
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 617
Allocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)
   
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
29/04/1967 Sightings Lineside at Ince: Passing John Thickitt Link
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
07/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
06/02/1972 Sightings Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed RO 4/1972 Link
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47205    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW)    
28/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
30/09/2004 Withdrawn Condemned as 47205    

prev prev