Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1812 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25443 Week
» 90397 Month
» 293061 Year
» 3319914 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1857 |
06/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47207 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
619 |
To Service |
06/08/1965 to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
Withdrawn |
30/09/2004 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys |
Cut Up |
on 22/01/2005 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
06/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/08/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 09/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1857 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 619 Allocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47207 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
21/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
07/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47207 |
|
|
22/01/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|