Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3393 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16799 Week
» 69815 Month
» 189342 Year
» 3216195 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1858 |
13/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47208 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/08/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 09/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1858 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 620 Allocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47208 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
21/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
29/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
31/10/1979 |
To Store |
To Store (Unserviceable) |
|
|
27/01/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47208 |
|
|
04/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Kennedy & Co, Ltd.: at Dundee MPD |
|
|