Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1837 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15243 Week
» 68259 Month
» 187786 Year
» 3214639 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D186 |
09/11/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46049 |
05/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
09/11/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
12/12/1982 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys |
Cut Up |
30/10/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/10/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/11/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
30/10/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/11/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D186 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
05/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46049 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
12/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46049 |
|
|
30/10/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|