Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4111 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17517 Week
» 70533 Month
» 190060 Year
» 3216913 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1865 |
28/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47215 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/05/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1865 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 627 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
04/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47215 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
01/03/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47215 |
|
|
14/09/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: at Cardiff Canton MPD |
|
|