Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 330 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18133 Week
» 71149 Month
» 190676 Year
» 3217529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1866 |
28/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47216 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47299 |
12/1981 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/05/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1866 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 628 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
27/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47216 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
12/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47299 |
|
|
01/04/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47299 |
|
|
01/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|