Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 852 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14258 Week
» 67274 Month
» 186801 Year
» 3213654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1868 |
28/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47218 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/05/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
01/1979 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/03/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1868 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 630 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
23/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47218 |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|