Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1052 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14458 Week
» 67474 Month
» 187001 Year
» 3213854 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1872 |
17/06/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47222 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/06/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/06/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/06/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1872 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 634 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
19/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47222 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/08/1998 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|
25/08/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47222 |
|
|