Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2434 Week
» 12569 Month
» 328800 Year
» 839902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1885 09/07/1965
TOPS (1973) 47366 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 647
To Service 09/07/1965
Withdrawn 28/01/1999
Time in Service 33 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 30/04/1999
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40B Immingham (New) 09/07/1965
30A Stratford w/e 29/01/1966
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 26/03/1966
40B Immingham w/e 23/04/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 09/09/1967
40B Immingham w/e 12/10/1968
TI Tinsley 4w/e 06/10/1973
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 11/05/1974
TO Toton w/e 11/10/1975
SF Stratford w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 28/01/1999


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/07/1965 To Service To service as D1885
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 647
Allocated to Immingham (40B)
   
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47366    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
28/01/1999 Withdrawn Condemned as 47366    
30/04/1999 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    

prev prev