Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2087 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15493 Week
» 68509 Month
» 188036 Year
» 3214889 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1887 |
17/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47368 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
649 |
To Service |
17/08/1965 to Immingham (40B) |
Withdrawn |
31/10/2007 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/08/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1887 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 649 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47368 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
25/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/06/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
31/10/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47368 |
|
|