Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1103 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18906 Week
» 71922 Month
» 191449 Year
» 3218302 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1893 |
13/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47374 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/08/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1893 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 655 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
04/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47374 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
31/07/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47374 |
|
|
09/09/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|