Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2042 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19845 Week
» 72861 Month
» 192388 Year
» 3219241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1897 |
02/09/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47378 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
02/09/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
04/11/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/11/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/11/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/09/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
04/11/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1897 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 659 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47378 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
27/11/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
25/08/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47378 |
|
|
09/1998 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|