Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 512 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18315 Week
» 71331 Month
» 190858 Year
» 3217711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1898 |
24/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47379 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
24/08/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/08/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1898 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 660 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47379 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|
14/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47379 |
|
|