Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1899 |
26/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47380 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
26/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/08/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1899 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 661 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47380 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
25/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
30/07/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47380 |
|
|
18/10/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|