Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1464 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19267 Week
» 72283 Month
» 191810 Year
» 3218663 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1909 |
19/10/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47232 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47665 |
04/03/1987 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47820 |
20/09/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/10/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/10/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
08/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
lX |
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
lX |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1909 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 671 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47232 |
|
|
08/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/03/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47665 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
20/09/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47820 |
|
|
01/09/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47820 |
|
|