Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1215 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14621 Week
» 67637 Month
» 187164 Year
» 3214017 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D192 |
26/01/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46055 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
26/01/1963 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
31/10/1982 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
08/12/1984 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/01/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
19/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/01/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D192 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46055 |
|
|
31/10/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46055 |
|
|
08/12/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|