Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 677 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18480 Week
» 71496 Month
» 191023 Year
» 3217876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1924 |
20/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47247 |
12/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47655 |
10/09/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47810 |
23/02/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/12/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/12/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
lX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1924 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 686 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
29/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47247 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/09/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47655 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
23/02/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47810 |
|
|