Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1855 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15261 Week
» 68277 Month
» 187804 Year
» 3214657 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1930 |
12/02/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47253 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47530 |
24/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/02/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/02/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/02/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1930 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 692 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47253 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47530 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/11/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47530 |
|
|
01/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|