Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 135 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17938 Week
» 70954 Month
» 190481 Year
» 3217334 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1932 |
24/02/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47493 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47701 |
01/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
24/02/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/02/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
12/01/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/02/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1932 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 694 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47493 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47701 |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/12/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47701 |
|
|