Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2306 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20109 Week
» 73125 Month
» 192652 Year
» 3219505 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1935 |
18/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47257 |
06/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47650 |
04/07/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47805 |
03/08/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/03/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
12/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/03/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1980 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1935 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 697 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47257 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/07/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47650 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
03/08/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47805 |
|
|