Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1846 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15252 Week
» 68268 Month
» 187795 Year
» 3214648 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1937 |
07/04/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47495 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47704 |
02/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
07/04/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Modified AWS (noise reduction) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/04/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/04/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1937 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 699 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47495 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified AWS (noise reduction) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
02/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47704 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/05/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47704 |
|
|
12/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|