Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3418 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17461 Week
» 82415 Month
» 285079 Year
» 3311932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1938 |
27/04/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47258 |
01/12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/04/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/04/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 11/1978 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/04/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1938 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 700 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47258 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
21/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
11/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47258 |
|
|
05/02/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|