Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 819 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2727 Week
» 18925 Month
» 183825 Year
» 694927 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1946 06/07/1966
TOPS (1973) 47503 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 708
To Service 06/07/1966
Withdrawn 01/03/2000
Time in Service 33 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D16 Nottingham Division (New) 06/07/1966
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 15/10/1966
ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 11/03/1967
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 14/10/1967
D02 Birmingham Division 17/06/1968
D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/12/1969
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 10/03/1973
   Withdrawn 01/03/2000

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/07/1966 To Service To service as D1946
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 708
Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16)
   
15/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
14/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
06/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47503    
09/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
01/03/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 47503    

prev prev