Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1412 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19215 Week
» 72231 Month
» 191758 Year
» 3218611 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1947 |
04/07/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47504 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47702 |
03/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/07/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
30/12/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
30/12/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
18/02/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/07/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 30/08/1970 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
30/12/1972 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
18/02/1973 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
WR ATC |
|
|
07/1976 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1947 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 709 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
16/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
18/02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
17/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
05/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47504 |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
03/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47702 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/04/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47702 |
|
|
01/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Toton Training Compound |
|
|