Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 558 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18361 Week
» 71377 Month
» 190904 Year
» 3217757 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1948 |
01/08/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47505 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47712 |
09/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
01/08/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
07/10/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/10/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
05/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/08/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
08/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
09/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
WR ATC |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
05/1976 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/08/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1948 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 610 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
22/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47505 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47712 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|