Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3997 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17403 Week
» 70419 Month
» 189946 Year
» 3216799 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1950 |
09/09/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47259 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47552 |
02/1975 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47802 |
13/07/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/09/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1975 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/09/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 03/1975 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
11/1981 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1950 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 612 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47259 but not taken up |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47552 |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
06/09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
13/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47802 |
|
|