Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2289 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 17901 Week
» 116546 Month
» 319210 Year
» 3346063 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1956 |
22/12/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47260 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47553 |
28/09/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47803 |
21/03/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
22/12/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/12/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
09/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
13/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1956 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 618 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47260 |
|
|
10/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
28/09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47553 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
22/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
21/03/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47803 |
|
|
01/04/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47803 |
|
|
02/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|