Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 371 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18174 Week
» 71190 Month
» 190717 Year
» 3217570 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1957 |
28/01/1967 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47261 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47554 |
10/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47705 |
03/1979 |
|
TOPS (57/3) |
57303 |
27/02/2003 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
28/01/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
10/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/01/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
10/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1957 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 619 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47261 but not taken up |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47554 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47705 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
27/02/2003 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57303 |
|
|