Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3969 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17375 Week
» 70391 Month
» 189918 Year
» 3216771 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1960 |
11/11/1967 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47514 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47703 |
03/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
11/11/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/11/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
09/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/11/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1960 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 622 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47514 |
|
|
03/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47703 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|