Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2457 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15863 Week
» 68879 Month
» 188406 Year
» 3215259 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1961 |
03/05/1968 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47515 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
03/05/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1973 |
|
Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
|
|
05/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
05/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/05/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
05/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/05/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1961 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 623 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
22/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47515 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
28/03/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47515 |
|
|
05/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Crewe DMD |
|
|