Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1325 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14731 Week
» 67747 Month
» 187274 Year
» 3214127 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1968 |
16/10/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47516 |
10/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47708 |
06/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/10/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 11/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/10/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 11/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1968 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47516 |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
29/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47708 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/04/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47708 |
|
|
08/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|