Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 143 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6120 Week
» 22318 Month
» 187218 Year
» 698320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1971 30/10/1965
TOPS (1973) 47270 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 30/10/1965
Withdrawn 28/02/2007
Time in Service 41 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64B Haymarket (New) 30/10/1965
52A Gateshead w/e 12/10/1968
64B Haymarket w/e 11/10/1969
   Withdrawn 28/02/2007


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1965 To Service To service as D1971
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Haymarket (64B)
   
02/10/1968 Sightings D6129 arrived at Waverley from Bonar Bridge with a 3 coach special conveying Sheik Zaid of Abu Dhabi. The occupants had been on a shooting party. The train was taken on to Kings Cross by D1971 (1F50) RO 12/1968  
12/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus RO 9/1969 Link
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47270    
28/02/2007 Withdrawn Condemned as 47270    

prev prev