Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 139 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 23770 Week
» 88724 Month
» 291388 Year
» 3318241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1975 |
20/11/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47517 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
20/11/1965 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
01/09/2003 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 04/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/11/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 02/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/11/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1975 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47517 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/09/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47517 |
|
|
04/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|