Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2023 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19826 Week
» 72842 Month
» 192369 Year
» 3219222 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1977 |
11/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47275 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/12/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
11/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
16/08/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/12/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
11/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
16/08/1978 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1977 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47275 |
|
|
16/08/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/09/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47275 |
|
|
11/03/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|