Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1803 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19606 Week
» 72622 Month
» 192149 Year
» 3219002 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1982 |
23/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47280 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
23/12/1965 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
28/02/2007 |
Time in Service |
41 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
12/2007 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/12/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/12/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
lX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1982 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
20/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47280 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47280 |
|
|
12/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|