Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1436 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19239 Week
» 72255 Month
» 191782 Year
» 3218635 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1983 |
30/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47281 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/12/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/12/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
01/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1983 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
27/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47281 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
17/12/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47281 |
|
|
08/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|