Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 266 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19177 Week
» 84131 Month
» 286795 Year
» 3313648 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1986 |
21/01/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47284 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/01/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 02/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/01/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1986 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
21/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47284 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
30/11/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|
14/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47284 |
|
|