Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1437 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19240 Week
» 72256 Month
» 191783 Year
» 3218636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1987 |
29/01/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47285 |
21/12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/01/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
07/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/01/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
07/1981 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/01/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1987 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
21/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47285 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/12/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47285 |
|
|
05/02/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|