Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1515 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19318 Week
» 72334 Month
» 191861 Year
» 3218714 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1993 |
26/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47291 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
26/03/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/03/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
02/1980 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1993 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47291 |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
30/11/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
25/08/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47291 |
|
|
17/06/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|