Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 98 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 15420 Month
» 346909 Year
» 423496 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1994 16/04/1966
TOPS (1973) 47292 05/12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 16/04/1966
Withdrawn 28/02/2007
Time in Service 40 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 16/04/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 07/05/1966
50A York (North) w/e 16/07/1966
55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 10/09/1966
56A Wakefield 4w/e 25/03/1967
66A Polmadie 3w/e 20/05/1967
56A Knottingley 4w/e 12/08/1967
91N To North Eastern Region 4w/e 26/08/1967
34G Finsbury Park w/e 25/11/1967
91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 02/12/1967
41A Tinsley w/e 13/09/1969
   Withdrawn 28/02/2007


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/04/1966 To Service To service as D1994
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
07/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
10/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Knottingley (56A)    
26/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
25/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
02/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
13/09/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 47292    
28/02/2007 Withdrawn Condemned as 47292    

prev prev