Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1437 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19240 Week
» 72256 Month
» 191783 Year
» 3218636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1997 |
03/06/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47295 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
03/06/1966 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
31/01/2003 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys |
Cut Up |
01/2003 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/06/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/09/1981 |
|
Slow Speed Control isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/06/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
08/12/1970 |
Severe |
|
Mechanical seizures or failures |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/06/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1997 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47295 |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
27/09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control isolated |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
01/2003 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
31/01/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47295 |
|
|