Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 94 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3711 Week
» 15416 Month
» 346905 Year
» 423492 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1997 03/06/1966
TOPS (1973) 47295 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 03/06/1966
Withdrawn 31/01/2003
Time in Service 36 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 31/01/2003
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 03/06/1966
56A Wakefield 4w/e 25/03/1967
34G Finsbury Park w/e 25/11/1967
52A Gateshead w/e 09/08/1969
41A Tinsley w/e 02/12/1972
   Withdrawn 31/01/2003

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/06/1966 To Service To service as D1997
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
25/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/08/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
30/01/1972 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. RO 4/1972 Link
02/12/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47295    
31/01/2003 Withdrawn Condemned as 47295    

prev prev